# Multiply any 2 digit numbers

In this tutorial, we are going to learn the shortcut how to multiply any 2 digit numbers.  This method of multiplication is called Criss-Cross method of multiplication.

If both the multiplicand and the multiplier is a 2-digit number, you can get the answer in 3 steps.

Let’s explain with an example.  Suppose you want to multiply 32×21.

Let’s understand the steps involved.

Step 1 :  Multiply the digits in the unit place, that is 2×1=2. This will be the unit digit of the answer as well.

Step 2 :  Now this is important. Now, we cross-multiply the numbers 3×1=2 and 2×2=4 and add them. This is why it is referred to as  the term criss-cross multiplication. Write 7 in the 10’s place of the answer.

Step 3 :  This is the last step. You just multiply the digits in the 10’s place, that is 3×2=6.

So, the product will be :

The complete steps involved in the calculation can be illustrated in the following figure.

If you practice this shortcut, you can multiply the any 2 -digit numbers mentally without actually doing any computation.

Let’s take another example.  Let’s consider the multiplication 47×32. The complete steps involved in the calculation is illustrated in the figure:

Notice the carry-forward in each step. It is important to note that only 1 digit should be retained in each steps. The rest is carry forward.

Important Note :

Number of steps involved in the criss-cross multiplication  = 2x(number of digits) – 1

• For 2-digit multiplication, number of steps : 2×2- 1 = 3
• For 3-digit multiplication, number of steps : 2×3- 1 = 5
• For 4-digit multiplication, number of steps : 2×4- 1 = 7

Easy ?

Exercise : On the similar lines, can you multiply,

• 18 x 19
• 72 x 43
• 92 x 99
• 56 x 65

Tagged , , , . Bookmark the permalink.

### 5 Responses to Multiply any 2 digit numbers

1. nike air max says:

wow, awesome blog article.Really looking forward to read more. Awesome.

2. anubhav says:

superb

3. kumar gaurav says: