In the previous tutorial on Mathematical Shortcuts, we saw how to memorize the multiplication table upto 100. In this article, we will discuss, how to remember multiplication tables upto 1000. Memorizing multiplication was one of the hardest thing, that I had to do growing up as a student. However, if you are well-versed with basic multiplication and addition, I can confidently tell, you can easily remember the multiplication tables upto 1000. I would go a step further, you can in-fact remember the multiplication tables upto 10000.
Example 1 : Let us say you want to recall the multiplication table of 123. If you look 123 as a single number, it would be impossible really to recall the multiplication table. However, the trick is to break the number such that the multiplication easier.
Tables |
Multiplication |
||
123 x 1 |
12 / 3 x 1 |
12 / 3 |
123 |
123 x 2 |
12 / 3 x 2 |
24 / 6 |
246 |
123 x 3 |
12 / 3 x 3 |
36 / 9 |
369 |
123 x 4 |
12 / 3 x 4 |
48 / 12 |
492 |
123 x 5 |
12 / 3 x 5 |
60 / 15 |
615 |
123 x 6 |
12 / 3 x 6 |
72 /18 |
738 |
123 x 7 |
12 / 3 x 7 |
84 / 21 |
861 |
123 x 8 |
12 / 3 x 8 |
96 / 24 |
984 |
123 x 9 |
12 / 3 x 9 |
108 / 27 |
1107 |
123 x 10 |
12 / 3 x 10 |
120 / 30 |
1230 |
You know, it is possible to break the number 123 into 1 and 23. But then, we need to know the multiplication table of 23 which is difficult compared to breaking the number as 12 and 3.
Now, let us consider another example.
Example 2 : Can you obtain the multiplication table of 913 ?
Tables |
Multiplication |
||
913 x 1 |
9 / 13 x 1 |
9 / 13 |
913 |
913 x 2 |
9 / 13 x 2 |
18 / 26 |
1826 |
913 x 3 |
9 / 13 x 3 |
27 / 39 |
2739 |
913 x 4 |
9 / 13 x 4 |
36 / 52 |
3652 |
913 x 5 |
9 / 13 x 5 |
45 / 65 |
4565 |
913 x 6 |
9 / 13 x 6 |
54 / 78 |
5478 |
913 x 7 |
9 / 13 x 7 |
63 / 91 |
6391 |
913 x 8 |
9 / 13 x 8 |
72 / 104 |
7304 |
913 x 9 |
9 / 13 x 9 |
81 / 117 |
8217 |
913 x 10 |
9 / 13 x 10 |
90 / 130 |
9130 |
If you notice, we break the number 913 into 9 and 13. It is possible to break the numbers into 91 and 3. However, for that, we need to know the multiplication table of 91.
Please note the difference from the previous example. Here we have 2 digits 13 on the right. So in the answer, we keep 2 digits and the rest is carry forward.
So, the idea is instead of multiplying the whole number as-is, we break the number such that it is easier with the mathematical calculation. With practice, you will be able to multiply and obtain the multiplication without doing any calculation.
Example 3 : Let us consider another example. Can you obtain the multiplication table of 456?
If you notice, when we break the number 456 into 45 and 6, we donot know the multiplication of table 45. However, we have discussed how to remember multiplication tables upto 100. With proper practice, you can easily compute and remember any multiplication table upto 1000.
Tables |
Multiplication |
||
456 x 1 |
45 / 6 x 1 |
45 / 6 |
456 |
456 x 2 |
45 / 6 x 2 |
90 / 12 |
912 |
456 x 3 |
45 / 6 x 3 |
135 / 18 |
1368 |
456 x 4 |
45 / 6 x 4 |
180 / 24 |
1824 |
456 x 5 |
45 / 6 x 5 |
225 / 30 |
2280 |
456 x 6 |
45 / 6 x 6 |
270 / 36 |
2736 |
456 x 7 |
45 / 6 x 7 |
315 / 42 |
3192 |
456 x 8 |
45 / 6 x 8 |
360 / 48 |
3648 |
456 x 9 |
45 / 6 x 9 |
405 / 54 |
4104 |
456 x 10 |
45 / 6 x 10 |
450 / 60 |
4560 |
With proper practice and understanding, you can easily compute and remember the multiplication table even upto 10000.
Let us take a very simple example so that is clear to you.
Example 4 : Can you obtain the multiplication table of 1213.
Tables |
Multiplication |
||
1213 x 1 |
12 / 13 x 1 |
12 / 13 |
1213 |
1213 x 2 |
12 / 13 x 2 |
24 / 26 |
2426 |
1213 x 3 |
12 / 13 x 3 |
36 / 39 |
3639 |
1213 x 4 |
12 / 13 x 4 |
48 / 52 |
4852 |
1213 x 5 |
12 / 13 x 5 |
60 / 65 |
6065 |
1213 x 6 |
12 / 13 x 6 |
72 / 78 |
7278 |
1213 x 7 |
12 / 13 x 7 |
84 / 91 |
8491 |
1213 x 8 |
12 / 13 x 8 |
96 / 104 |
9704 |
1213 x 9 |
12 / 13 x 9 |
108 / 117 |
10917 |
1213 x 10 |
12 / 13 x 10 |
120 / 130 |
12130 |
Notice, now we break the number 1213 into 12 and 13 and perform separate multiplication and later combine it.
Try yourself
Can you obtain the multiplication table of :
- 154
- 924
- 817
- 708
- 2113
- 4505
I hope you find the tutorial very useful. Please leave a comment or contact me, if you have any doubts or any comments on this topic. I would be glad to answer.
very helpful.please post shortcut tricks for number series and data interpretation.
I shall do it soon, Write to me with your specific questions, I shall try to answer it.
Thanks
Kiran
please post shortcuts for number series.
Kiran, U r amazing I really appreciate ur efforts, I am searching square root short tricks and hit to ur site and after reading few articles I simply fall in love with ur technique and explanation.
If I stuck somewhere then I think you are the right person to approach
Hello Niraj,
Thank you so much for your kind words. I am glad you liked my work and the shortcuts.
I never learn anywhere else all such shortcut tricks, thank u so much sir for ur efforts … !!!
I am glad you liked it. Thanks
श्री.करणजी
आपका बहोत धन्यवाद.
आपके द्वारा दियागया टेबल याद करनेका तरीका बहोत असान है.
अपेक्षा है की मैं मेरे 5 वी कक्षा के बेटे को इसे अच्छी तरहा समझा सकुंगा.
अभय भंडारी
Your blog can go viral, you need some initial traffic only.
How to get more visitors??? Search in google for: Mamjo’s massive traffic source