# How to multiply any number by 12

In this tutorial we are going to see how to multiply any number with 12. It is an extension of how to multiply any number with 11. In principle, the shortcut is similar to multiplying any number with 11. Let us understand the steps with a simple example.

Example 1 :
Consider the multiplication 431 x 12

Step 1 : Starting from right, double to right-most digit. So, we have 1, double it to get 2.

Step 2 : Leaving the unit-digit, double every digit and add the previous digit in the number taking care of the carry-forward in each step.

Step 3 : In the last step, just keep the last digit 4 as it is. This step is very important. You should not double the digit in the last step.

The entire steps can be illustrated using the following figure : Let us consider another example to make this shortcut clear.

Example 2 :
Consider the multiplication 431 x 12

The steps are illustrated in the following figure. Notice that, we need to retain only digit in each step and the rest are carry-forward. Example 3
: Consider the multiplication 8532 x 12 Very easy right 🙂

Using this shortcut, can you multiply the following:

1. 83837 x 12
2. 4774 x 12
3. 84 x 12
4. 484848 x 12

I hope, you find this shortcut, very useful. Please leave a comment in the comment section or contact me with your feedback or comments. I would be glad to help. ### Kiran Chandrashekhar

Hey, Thanks for dropping by. My name is Kiran Chandrashekhar. I am a full-time software freelancer. I love Maths and Mathematical Shortcuts. Numbers fascinate me. I will be posting articles on Mathematical Shortcuts, Software Tips, Programming Tips in this website. I love teaching students preparing for various competitive examinations. Read my complete story.